CO SB062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning procedures of the committee on legal services.
Title
Committee On Legal Services Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-062 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-062 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |