CO SB057 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements for private education lenders.
Title
Private Lenders Of Student Loans Acts And Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-057, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment J) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment I) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment H) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-057, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-057, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment J) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment I) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment H) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-057, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-057 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |