CO SB057 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Claims Task Force Reporting Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Claims Task Force Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-18SenateGovernor Signed
2015-03-12SenateSent to the Governor
2015-03-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-24HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
2015-02-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-01-30SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-01-29SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-01-26SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-01-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057sblt_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/838EB62EAA74ED5287257DA20061938E/$FILE/057_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FC9EEDFED6B4B36587257DD90074E6DC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FC9EEDFED6B4B36587257DD90074E6DC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/128FA4DAA1DA29FE87257DD90074DAD6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/290F4BF0BC2B149487257DF600754C85

Bill Comments

feedback