CO SB056 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning surplus military vehicles, and, in connection therewith, exempting a surplus military vehicle from the statutory definition of an "off-highway vehicle" if the vehicle is owned or leased by a municipality, county, or fire protection district for the purpose of assisting firefighting efforts and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus Military Vehicles Highway Use If Firefighting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-056 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13 Governor Signed
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
2020-05-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 05/28/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2020-02-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-27SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-056
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_056_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_056_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_056_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_056_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_056_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_056_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bd5c0ee7d485a4b872584fc00764c68-sb20-056-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ba112dd19ec2c4b18725850b005a310f-sb20-056-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ba112dd19ec2c4b18725850b005a310f-sb20-056-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-056vote5dc5ca
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0954b0e037d57bf7872585200063f458-sb20-056-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/434a0886a07735f18725852a004e1dd2-sb20-056-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/434a0886a07735f18725852a004e1dd2-sb20-056-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-056vote5eae25
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-056vote5e94fb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-056vote5e7ef8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0954b0e037d57bf7872585200063f458-sb20-056-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback