CO SB056 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning monetary amounts in civil actions.
Title
Civil Jurisdiction Of County Courts And Filing Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Yeulin Willett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-056, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |