CO SB056 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Frequency Of Statewide Social Studies Testing
Title
Frequency Of Statewide Social Studies Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-056 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |