CO SB055 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Electric Cooperative Election Procedures
Title
Rural Electric Cooperative Election Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-055 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |