CO SB052 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the smart school bus safety pilot program.
Title
Smart School Bus Safety Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 20-052 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-052, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Finance |