CO SB052 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health Benefit Exchange Review Committee Approval
Title
Health Benefit Exchange Review Committee Approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-052 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-052 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-052 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-052 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |