CO SB051 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning preparation of a skilled workforce for the changing nature of work.
Title
Conforming Workforce Development Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 23-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 23-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |