CO SB051 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rights of crime victims.
Title
Revisions To Victims' Rights Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-051 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-051, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans, and Military Affairs. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-051 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-051, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans, and Military Affairs. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |