CO SB050 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Value Of Condemned Conservation Easement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Value Of Condemned Conservation Easement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-050 to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-050 to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-050 to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-50, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-50, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-50, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-08 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-18 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-16 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-06 House Third Reading Passed
2011-05-05 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2011-05-04 House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-05-02 Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2011-04-28 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-04-27 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-04-25 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-04-19 Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-02-17 Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-01-19 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Legislative Council

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050sagr_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F06A3AFDA0781886872578010060526B/$FILE/050_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A23B29E6E01C7AFB8725783A007EFC26
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F308AD66611A87B78725787700677E69
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CF70540B1F24D22E87257886006DB504
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A23B29E6E01C7AFB8725783A007EFC26
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F308AD66611A87B78725787700677E69
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CF70540B1F24D22E87257886006DB504
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A23B29E6E01C7AFB8725783A007EFC26
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F308AD66611A87B78725787700677E69
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CF70540B1F24D22E87257886006DB504

Bill Comments

feedback