CO SB049 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the registration exemption for special mobile machinery, and, in connection therewith, eliminating the requirement that an owner of such machinery regularly have at least one thousand items of such machinery in the state to obtain a registration exempt certificate for the machinery and making an appropriation.
Title
Special Mobile Machinery Registration Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-049 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-049 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-05 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |