CO SB048 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring an officer to arrest an offender who escapes from an intensive supervision program in the department of corrections.
Title
Require Arrests Of Intensive Supervision Program Escapees From Department Of Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-048, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-048, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |