CO SB046 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an amendment to the definition of "appraisal management company" to align with the definition in federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appraisal Management Company Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-046 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2019-01-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-046
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_046_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_046_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_046_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_046_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_046_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64943b7c60d861fc8725838b00734c7e-sb19-046-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-046vote5a5f72
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/794533b9123da97c872583ae00715c4d-sb19-046-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-046vote5bebb0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-046vote5eaa0b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-046vote5eb527

Bill Comments

feedback