CO SB044 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the statewide emergency medical and trauma care system in the department of public health and environment, and, in connection therewith, eliminating the requirement that the state board of health cooperate with the department of personnel in adopting certain criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Emergency Medical And Trauma Care System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-044 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor Signed
2019-03-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2019-01-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-16SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-044
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_044_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_044_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_044_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_044_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_044_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_044_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/32d189f5517a50cd87258384005b7a2c-sb19-044-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-044vote5e62d6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/35f20faf3a32a2e3872583a90062b07d-sb19-044-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-044vote599d47

Bill Comments

feedback