CO SB042 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the membership of the board of commissioners of the Colorado state fair authority.
Title
Colorado State Fair Authority Board Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-07 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |