CO SB042 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the offices of the governor, lieutenant governor, and state planning and budgeting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Governor, Lt Governor, & OSPB Supplemental

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-042 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-21 Governor Signed
2021-03-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-03-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-03-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-02-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2021-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-02-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-042
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_042_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_042_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_042_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_042_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_042_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_042_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB042_J.016.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0042_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfdf5f8c9dfdcd25872586850052a05c-sb21-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-042vote5a945c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb2a659c0433b8d58725868c00504eed-sb21-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-042vote5e4f37
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-042vote6431fe
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-042vote6448b9

Bill Comments 750

feedback