CO SB042 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning adoption of an agreement among the states to elect the president of the United States by national popular vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Popular Vote

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.030) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.029) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.019) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.027) (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.022) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.031) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment X). (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment Y). (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Governor Signed
2019-03-06 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-01-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-042
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_042_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_042_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_042_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_042_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_042_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_042_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/62122f64a926d8678725838b00731ab3-sb19-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote73d46b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote7349d1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote5e074b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d4abc1befaf109e28725839f00823ee5-sb19-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote15bf20
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote1590c0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote15512b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote14c5a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote133d13
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote136d7c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote13ae4f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote144f02
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote14f4f3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote151d7d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-042vote5c0aa4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d4abc1befaf109e28725839f00823ee5-sb19-042-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d4abc1befaf109e28725839f00823ee5-sb19-042-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d4abc1befaf109e28725839f00823ee5-sb19-042-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback