CO SB041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a required contract provision regarding the payment of premiums by a policyholder to a health insurance carrier for each individual covered under a health insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Contract Carrier And Policyholder

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-02-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-041
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_041_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_041_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_041_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_041_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_041_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/869f4bc60ffda891872583a10073c612-sb19-041-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/869f4bc60ffda891872583a10073c612-sb19-041-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-041vote593862
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64ae867f2d351386872583bb00583d9e-sb19-041-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-041vote5a7339
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-041vote56a2bf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-041vote56bce9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64ae867f2d351386872583bb00583d9e-sb19-041-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64ae867f2d351386872583bb00583d9e-sb19-041-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback