CO SB040 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the regulation of genetic counselors, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require License Practice Genetic Counseling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-040 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-040 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-040 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-040 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-040 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
2020-03-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2020-03-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-04SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-01-30SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-040
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_040_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_040_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_040_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0ce1f3d1c666a8ba872584ff00833644-sb20-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/86bcc48b500a0245872585040078f124-sb20-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bea83233ef543da887258519005405b6-sb20-040-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bea83233ef543da887258519005405b6-sb20-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-040vote5a1201
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b46d136b5409a1898725852a00627d9f-sb20-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/afac902f25c1779887258537007e448a-sb20-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/caf659727ec39cd287258576007061ca-sb20-040-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback