CO SB040 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Coach Youth Sports Concussions Ed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coach Youth Sports Concussions Ed

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-29 Governor Action - Signed
2011-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2011-03-22 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-03-22 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-03-17 Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2011-03-14 House Third Reading Passed
2011-03-11 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-08 House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-02-25 Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment
2011-02-22 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-02-21 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-02-15 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-02-10 Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-01-13 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040he_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9CE9CEE12645CAA8725780800800D80/$FILE/040_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B7A653F1CD0831678725783300806FF7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C10170885863EFF58725784D00838522
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B7A653F1CD0831678725783300806FF7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C10170885863EFF58725784D00838522

Bill Comments 750

feedback