CO SB038 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the allowable uses of reclaimed domestic wastewater, and, in connection therewith, allowing reclaimed domestic wastewater to be used for industrial hemp cultivation and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reclaimed Water Use On Industrial Hemp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-038, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-038, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: J.001 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-038 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-038, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003, severed section 2, consisting of page 2 lines 5 through 8. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-038, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
2018-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-18SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-038
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_038_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_038_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_038_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_038_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_038_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_038_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-01-18t133208z-sb18-038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-01-18t133208z-sb18-038-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-01-18t133208z-sb18-038-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-11t093343z-sb18-038-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-11t093343z-sb18-038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-038vote5acf12
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-23t133246z-sb18-038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-23t133246z-sb18-038-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-23t133246z-sb18-038-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-23t133246z-sb18-038-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-038-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-038vote5a65ec
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-038vote13ad84
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-038vote13b67c

Bill Comments

feedback