CO SB036 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-18)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-18)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a change to the application process for the property tax exemption for veterans with a disability.
Title
Veterans With Disab Prop Tax Exemption Reqmnts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-036 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-036 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-036 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-036 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-036 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-036 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |