CO SB036 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the submission to the federal environmental protection agency of a proposed revision to the state implementation plan that would enable a vehicle that fails the on-board diagnostics test solely because a check engine light is illuminated on the vehicle's dashboard to undergo a tailpipe emissions test.
Title
Emissions Inspection Check Engine Light
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Postpone Senate Bill 20-036 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |