CO SB036 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
concerning groundwater.
Title
Appellate Process Concerning Groundwater Decisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-036 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-036 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |