CO SB036 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surety Reqmnt For Appealing Tax Bills Claimed Due
Title
Surety Reqmnt For Appealing Tax Bills Claimed Due
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment for no appropriations clause without restriction for supplemental The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment for no appropriations clause without restriction for supplemental The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment for no appropriations clause without restriction for supplemental The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment for no appropriations clause without restriction for supplemental The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-26 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |