CO SB033 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of a professional nurse to delegate dispensing authority for over-the-counter medications.
Title
Delegate Dispensing Over-the-counter Medications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-033 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002, as printed (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor, and Technology. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor, and Technology. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor , and Technology. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-033 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002, as printed (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor, and Technology. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor, and Technology. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-033, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor , and Technology. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services + Business, Labor, & Technology |