CO SB032 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the age of employees authorized to sell alcohol beverages at establishments licensed to sell alcohol beverages at retail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee Age To Sell Alcohol Retail Liquor Store

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-14 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2020-01-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-27SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-032
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_032_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_032_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_032_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_032_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_032_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_032_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/de48358f4cc08b2e872584fc00712420-sb20-032-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/de48358f4cc08b2e872584fc00712420-sb20-032-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-032vote59eac5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/877539d445b365168725852000623e0e-sb20-032-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-032vote5b9b43

Bill Comments

feedback