CO SB031 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning improving older Coloradans' access to trained geriatric specialist health-care providers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improve Health-care Access For Older Coloradans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-031 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-031 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-031 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05 Governor Signed
2023-05-05 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-04-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
2023-04-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-01-26SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-031
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_031_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_031_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_031_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_031_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_031_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_031_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/FFB74B7A4E05AE58872589890072A839/SB031_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/799D702B91D354B28725898D00741E11/SB031_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb031_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0031_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0031_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb031_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/87a3ba83bcb9d40d872589430071d4da-sb23-031-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d90339964628e238725898e0050d654-sb23-031-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d90339964628e238725898e0050d654-sb23-031-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d90339964628e238725898e0050d654-sb23-031-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-031vote5910c8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/62e3ac7790f282f787258995007481db-sb23-031-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f3846ef7af89c5f08725899f004ddc62-sb23-031-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-031vote5a4656

Bill Comments

feedback