CO SB029 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Colorado income tax liability of an individual in active duty military service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Residency Presumption For Military

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-029 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-029 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-029 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Governor Signed
2019-03-12 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-05SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-01HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance
2019-01-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-029
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_029_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_029_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_029_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_029_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_029_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_029_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f0051a148e202d1a8725838b0072943a-sb19-029-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-029vote5a5f6a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40f2dfb93a4b0fa3872583980070bd3c-sb19-029-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7699688f83b58fb7872583ac0070eb7a-sb19-029-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-029vote5fb66d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-029vote5e479a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-029vote5e6726

Bill Comments

feedback