CO SB029 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Architectural Paint Stewardship Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Architectural Paint Stewardship Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029 to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 6-5. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-029, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-12SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-12SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
2014-03-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment + Finance
2014-02-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2014 - No Amendments
2014-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-05SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029sagr_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029sagrapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C37EE35E40BDD15B87257C3000060A11/$FILE/029_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FBFB0FFDCAAED6B187257C760063DADC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3F6162E7BD0C50F187257C76006403A9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DEBC238E7335062587257C8600558822
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/61B8E227E5C27BE487257C8600557A42
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FBFB0FFDCAAED6B187257C760063DADC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3F6162E7BD0C50F187257C76006403A9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DEBC238E7335062587257C8600558822
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/61B8E227E5C27BE487257C8600557A42
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/ACA71183B7B55FFC87257CAF00740EDB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/77F1690DB74EF2AC87257CBD006210A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/ECFEF945914C5BB687257CC3004F2546

Bill Comments

feedback