CO SB029 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - Senate Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - Senate Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create Efficiencies In State & Local Gov
Title
Create Efficiencies In State & Local Gov
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that Senate Bill 10-029 be referred to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that Senate Bill 10-029 be referred to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Lost | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Appropriations |