CO SB028 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the promotion of healthy families through the sharing of information related to investigations of child abuse or neglect between departments of human services and military installations when a person affiliated with the military installation is involved with the investigation, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Healthy Families And Military Preparedness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-028 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: COW (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-028 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: COW (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |