CO SB027 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding of the food pantry assistance grant program.
Title
Food Pantry Assistance Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |