CO SB027 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid Option For Prescribed Drugs By Mail

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Option For Prescribed Drugs By Mail

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-027, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-027, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 or J.002...confused (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-027, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01SenateGovernor Signed
2016-05-12SenateSent to the Governor
2016-05-02SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-04-19SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2016-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-02-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2016-02-18SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-17SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-03SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-01-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027shhsapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C5E7F4A8D59F31C787257F24006599FF/$FILE/027_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/620E8F2A9963E41687257F4E00622911
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1D36D96791D8737687257F4E00621894
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/94504AC7CECDB6B487257F570054B5D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2AA54015A5D4B09D87257F570054AB77
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/9F07673CD768923487257F5D0053E377/$FILE/jour_037.pdf#216
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C36261048FEF790587257F700060E3DD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C36261048FEF790587257F700060E3DD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/016EFA1A4A38880A87257F700060973D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/257FBE288F3D4DA887257F96004DE053
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/8BC29AF47CC1496587257F99005A63C6/$FILE/Ap18.pdf#899
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/5AFD800B219F4FFB87257F9A004D70EF/$FILE/jour_098.pdf#785
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/257FBE288F3D4DA887257F96004DE053

Bill Comments

feedback