CO SB024 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the Colorado health service corps program administered by the department of public health and environment to expand the availability of behavioral health care providers in shortage areas in the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Expand Access Behavioral Health Care Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |