CO SB024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the hearsay exception for persons with an intellectual and developmental disability when a defendant is charged with a crime against an at-risk person.
Title
Clarify Intellectual And Developmental Disabilities Hearsay Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-024 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-024 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |