CO SB023 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Water Efficiency Savings To Instream Use
Title
Transfer Water Efficiency Savings To Instream Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-023 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-023 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Judiciary |
2014-03-31 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2014-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 3/3/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |