CO SB022 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adding aggravated motor vehicle theft to the list of convictions that apply to the offense of possession of weapons by previous offenders, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Possession Of Weapon By Previous Offender Crimes
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Paul Lundeen [R] |
Sen. Dylan Roberts [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Amended |
2023-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |