CO SB022 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Assistance Cliff Effect Pilot Program
Title
Child Care Assistance Cliff Effect Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |