CO SB022 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wildfire Risk Reduction Grant Program
Title
Wildfire Risk Reduction Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 22 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |