CO SB021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-9)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-9)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the "Audiology and Speech-language Pathology Interstate Compact", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Audiology And Speech-language Interstate Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-021 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-021 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-021 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-021 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |