CO SB019 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consumer protection for Coloradans purchasing vehicles from out-of-state online retailers.
Title
Out-of-state Online Retail Vehicle Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 23-019 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-019 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 23-019 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-019 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Governor Signed | |
2023-02-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-08 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |