CO SB017 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the determination that a load of fluid milk products hauled by a vehicle is not a divisible load under the vehicle weight limits permitted by law.
Title
Fluid Milk Products Not Divisible Load
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-017 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-017 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-02-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |