CO SB017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adding stress disorders to the list of debilitating medical conditions for the purposes of the use of medical marijuana.
Title
Allow Medical Marijuana Use For Stress Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment O). (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment O). (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/03/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |