CO SB015 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the unlawful advertising of marijuana.
Title
Unlawful Marijuana Advertising
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Amendment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Amendment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |