CO SB014 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of the Colorado youth advisory council.
Title
Colorado Youth Advisory Council Updates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-014 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-014 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |