CO SB014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring the department of corrections to disclose the location of inmates who are relocated to facilities outside of the state.
Title
Department Of Corrections Disclose Location Of Out-of-state Inmate
Sponsors
Sen. John Cooke [R] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] | Rep. Cole Wist [R] | Rep. Leslie Herod [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |