CO SB014 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana
Title
Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-014 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009. (Attachment B) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to strike section 5 on strike below committee report of the bill The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009. (Attachment B) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to strike section 5 on strike below committee report of the bill The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-27 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |